+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On July 19, 2023 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/29/2023 HJ 17
On July 18, 2023 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/29/2023); SJ 20
On July 11, 2023 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2023-2241e Adopted, VV, (In recess of 06/29/2023); SJ 20
On July 7, 2023 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2023-2241e: AA VV (in recess of) 06/29/2023
On June 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Sen. Carson Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, MA, VV; 06/01/2023; SJ 16
On May 18, 2023 in the House:
- Amendment # 2023-1404h: AA VV 05/18/2023 HJ 14 P. 6
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-1404h: MA VV 05/18/2023 HJ 14 P. 6
On May 10, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-1404h 05/03/2023 (Vote 20-0; CC)
On April 11, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 05/03/2023 09:00 am LOB 206-208
On March 29, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/12/2023 10:30 am LOB 206-208
On March 20, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Judiciary
On January 19, 2023 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 01/19/2023; SJ 4
On January 17, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 01/19/2023; SC 6A
On January 12, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/05/2023 and Referred to Judiciary; SJ 4
- Hearing: 01/17/2023, Room 100, SH, 01:30 pm; SC 6