+ − Actions (7)
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 03/24/2021 10:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/97709851457 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 02/25/2021 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs HJ 4 P. 48
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-0165s, RC 24Y-0N, MA; OT3rdg; 02/11/2021; SJ 4
- Committee Amendment # 2021-0165s, RC 24Y-0N, AA; 02/11/2021; SJ 4
On January 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0165s, 02/11/2021; SC 10
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Remote Hearing: 01/28/2021, 01:00 pm; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; SC 8
On January 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/06/2021 and Referred to Health and Human Services; SJ 3
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
February 11, 2021: Committee Amendment 0165s
- Yeas: 24
- Present/NV: 24
Details:
+
−
- Jeb Bradley: Yea
- David Watters: Yea
- Sharon Carson: Yea
- John Reagan: Yea
- Donna Soucy: Yea
- Lou D'Allesandro: Yea
- Chuck Morse: Yea
- Regina Birdsell: Yea
- Gary Daniels: Yea
- James Gray: Yea
- Cindy Rosenwald: Yea
- Kevin Avard: Yea
- Harold French: Yea
- Erin Hennessey: Yea
- Bob Giuda: Yea
- Ruth Ward: Yea
- Jay Kahn: Yea
- Kevin Cavanaugh: Yea
- Tom Sherman: Yea
- Suzanne Prentiss: Yea
- Rebecca Whitley: Yea
- Bill Gannon: Yea
- Rebecca Perkins Kwoka: Yea
- Denise Ricciardi: Yea
February 11, 2021: Ought to Pass w/Amendment
- Yeas: 24
- Present/NV: 24
Details:
+
−
- Jeb Bradley: Yea
- David Watters: Yea
- Sharon Carson: Yea
- John Reagan: Yea
- Donna Soucy: Yea
- Lou D'Allesandro: Yea
- Chuck Morse: Yea
- Regina Birdsell: Yea
- Gary Daniels: Yea
- James Gray: Yea
- Cindy Rosenwald: Yea
- Kevin Avard: Yea
- Harold French: Yea
- Erin Hennessey: Yea
- Bob Giuda: Yea
- Ruth Ward: Yea
- Jay Kahn: Yea
- Kevin Cavanaugh: Yea
- Tom Sherman: Yea
- Suzanne Prentiss: Yea
- Rebecca Whitley: Yea
- Bill Gannon: Yea
- Rebecca Perkins Kwoka: Yea
- Denise Ricciardi: Yea