+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On July 10, 2024 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 07/03/2024; Chapter 0175; Effective 09/01/2024
On June 19, 2024 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 HJ 16 P. 43
On June 19, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/13/2024); SJ 18
On May 9, 2024 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 05/09/2024 HJ 13 P. 63
On April 29, 2024 in the House:
- Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass 04/24/2024 (Vote 19-1; RC)
- Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1595h
On April 12, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 04/24/2024 10:00 am LOB 305
On April 5, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/10/2024 03:00 pm LOB 305-307
On April 2, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 03/28/2024 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development HJ 10 P. 228
On March 21, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment # 2024-1036s, AA, VV; 03/21/2024; SJ 7
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1036s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 03/21/2024; SJ 7
On March 11, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2024-1036s, 03/21/2024; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 11
On February 21, 2024 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 03/05/2024, Room 103, SH, 09:00 am; SC 9
On February 1, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/18/2024 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; SJ 3
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor