+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (31)
On August 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 08/04/2023; Chapter 0227; Effective 08/04/2023
On July 19, 2023 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/29/2023 HJ 17 P. 18
On July 18, 2023 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/29/2023); SJ 20
On June 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Sen. Carson Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, MA, VV; 06/15/2023; SJ 19
On June 8, 2023 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-1490h: MA VV 06/08/2023 HJ 15 P. 18
- Amendment # 2023-1490h: AA VV 06/08/2023 HJ 15 P. 18
- FLAM # 2023-1834h (Rep. Hynes): AF DV 43-323 06/08/2023 HJ 15 P. 19
- FLAM # 2023-1835h (Rep. T. Mannion): AF VV 06/08/2023 HJ 15 P. 20
On May 15, 2023 in the House:
- Removed from Consent (Reps. Hoell, Layon, Hynes, T. Mannion, Read, Granger, Gerhard, Post, Horrigan, Burnham) 05/15/2023 HJ 15 P. 3
On May 3, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-1490h 05/02/2023 (Vote 20-0; CC)
On April 26, 2023 in the House:
- ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 05/02/2023 10:30 am LOB 202-204
On April 19, 2023 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 04/26/2023 10:00 am LOB 206-208
On April 11, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/19/2023 09:00 am LOB 202-204
- ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 04/19/2023 09:30 am LOB 202-204
On April 7, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 04/06/2023 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety
On March 30, 2023 in the Senate:
- Inexpedient to Legislate, MF, VV; 03/30/2023; SJ 12
- Sen. Rosenwald Moved Ought to Pass; 03/30/2023; SJ 12
- Sen. Rosenwald Floor Amendment # 2023-1251s, AF, VV; 03/30/2023; SJ 12
- Sen. Gray Floor Amendment # 2023-1226s; 03/30/2023; SJ 12
- Sen. Gray Withdraws Floor Amendment # 2023-1226s; 03/30/2023; SJ 12
- Sen. Abbas Moved to Reconsider the vote on: Floor Amendment 2023-1251, MA, VV; 03/30/2023; SJ 12
- Sen. Rosenwald Floor Amendment # 2023-1251s, RC 11Y-12N, AF; 03/30/2023; SJ 12
- Sen. Gray Floor Amendment # 2023-1226s, RC 13Y-10N, AA; 03/30/2023; SJ 12
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-1226s, RC 14Y-9N, MA; OT3rdg; 03/30/2023; SJ 8
On March 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Special Order to 03/30/2023, Without Objection, MA; 03/16/2023 SJ 10
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/30/2023; SC 15
On February 28, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/16/2023; SC 13
On February 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Special Order to 03/16/2023, Without Objection, MA; 02/22/2023 SJ 8
On February 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 02/22/2023; SC 11
On January 12, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/05/2023 and Referred to Judiciary; SJ 4
- Hearing: 01/17/2023, Room 100, SH, 01:45 pm; SC 6
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (3)
March 30, 2023: Floor Amendment
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 23
- Absent: 1
Details:
+
−
- Jeb Bradley: Nay
- David Watters: Yea
- Sharon Carson: Yea
- Donna Soucy: Yea
- Lou D'Allesandro: Yea
- Regina Birdsell: Nay
- Shannon Chandley: Yea
- James Gray: Nay
- Keith Murphy: Nay
- Cindy Rosenwald: Yea
- Kevin Avard: Nay
- Ruth Ward: Nay
- Daniel Innis: Nay
- Debra Altschiller: Yea
- Donovan Fenton: Yea
- Timothy Lang: Nay
- Howard Pearl: Nay
- Daryl Abbas: Nay
- Suzanne Prentiss: Yea
- Rebecca Whitley: Yea
- Bill Gannon: Excused
- Rebecca Perkins Kwoka: Yea
- Denise Ricciardi: Nay
- Carrie Gendreau: Nay
March 30, 2023: Floor Amendment
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 23
- Absent: 1
Details:
+
−
- Jeb Bradley: Yea
- David Watters: Nay
- Sharon Carson: Yea
- Donna Soucy: Nay
- Lou D'Allesandro: Nay
- Regina Birdsell: Yea
- Shannon Chandley: Nay
- James Gray: Yea
- Keith Murphy: Yea
- Cindy Rosenwald: Nay
- Kevin Avard: Yea
- Ruth Ward: Yea
- Daniel Innis: Yea
- Debra Altschiller: Nay
- Donovan Fenton: Nay
- Timothy Lang: Yea
- Howard Pearl: Yea
- Daryl Abbas: Yea
- Suzanne Prentiss: Nay
- Rebecca Whitley: Nay
- Bill Gannon: Excused
- Rebecca Perkins Kwoka: Nay
- Denise Ricciardi: Yea
- Carrie Gendreau: Yea
March 30, 2023: Ought to Pass w/Amendment
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 23
- Absent: 1
Details:
+
−
- Jeb Bradley: Yea
- David Watters: Nay
- Sharon Carson: Yea
- Donna Soucy: Nay
- Lou D'Allesandro: Nay
- Regina Birdsell: Yea
- Shannon Chandley: Nay
- James Gray: Yea
- Keith Murphy: Yea
- Cindy Rosenwald: Nay
- Kevin Avard: Yea
- Ruth Ward: Yea
- Daniel Innis: Yea
- Debra Altschiller: Nay
- Donovan Fenton: Nay
- Timothy Lang: Yea
- Howard Pearl: Yea
- Daryl Abbas: Yea
- Suzanne Prentiss: Yea
- Rebecca Whitley: Nay
- Bill Gannon: Excused
- Rebecca Perkins Kwoka: Nay
- Denise Ricciardi: Yea
- Carrie Gendreau: Yea