+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 05/15/2018; Chapter 0055; Effective 07/14/2018
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled 04/19/2018 HJ 13 P. 2
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 04/12/2018); SJ 13
On April 5, 2018 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 04/05/2018 HJ 11 P. 3
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/05/2018 (Vote 10-0; CC) HC 13 P. 3
- Executive Session: 03/27/2018 LOB 206
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 03/27/2018 02:00 PM LOB 206
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Children and Family Law HJ 7 P. 53
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-0314s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 02/01/2018; SJ 3
- Committee Amendment # 2018-0314s, AA, VV; 02/01/2018; SJ 3
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0314s, 02/01/2018; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 5
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/23/2018, Room 100, SH, 09:20 am; SC 4
On January 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Judiciary; SJ 2
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor