+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (4)
On March 7, 2024 in the Senate:
- Inexpedient to Legislate, RC 16Y-8N, MA === BILL KILLED ===; 03/07/2024; SJ 6
On February 27, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/07/2024, Vote 3-2; SC 9A
On January 3, 2024 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/11/2024, Room 100, SH, 01:45 pm; SC 2
On December 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Judiciary; SJ 1