+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: RC 23Y-1N, MA; 03/09/2023; SJ 9
- Sen. Gray Moved Laid on Table, MA, VV; 03/09/2023; SJ 9
- Pending Motion OT3rdg; 03/09/2023; SJ 9
On February 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/09/2023; SC 12
On January 26, 2023 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 01/26/2023; SJ 5
On January 18, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 01/26/2023; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 7
On January 12, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/05/2023 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; SJ 4
- Hearing: 01/18/2023, Room 103, SH, 10:00 am; SC 6
+ − Vote
March 9, 2023: Ought to Pass
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 24