+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (4)
On March 21, 2024 in the Senate:
- Inexpedient to Legislate, MA, VV === BILL KILLED ===; 03/21/2024; SJ 7
On March 13, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/21/2024, Vote 3-2; SC 11
On January 10, 2024 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/18/2024, Room 100, SH, 02:00 pm; SC 3
On December 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Judiciary; SJ 1
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor