+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On October 24, 2024 in the Senate:
- Inexpedient to Legislate, Senate Rule 3-23, Adjournment 10/10/2024; SJ 18
On March 7, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment # 2024-0861s, AA, VV; 03/07/2024; SJ 6
- Sen. Carson Moved Laid on Table, 03/07/2024; SJ 6
- Sen. Carson Withdraws Motion to Lay on Table; 03/07/2024; SJ 6
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0861s, MA, VV; 03/07/2024; SJ 6
- Sen. Carson Moved Laid on Table, MA, VV; 03/07/2024; SJ 6
- Pending Motion OT3rdg; 03/07/2024; SJ 6
On February 28, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0861s, 03/07/2024, Vote 5-0; SC 9A
On January 10, 2024 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/18/2024, Room 100, SH, 01:30 pm; SC 3
On December 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Judiciary; SJ 1
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor