+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On July 10, 2024 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 07/03/2024; Chapter 0169; Effective 07/03/2024
On June 19, 2024 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 HJ 16 P. 43
On June 19, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/13/2024); SJ 18
On May 9, 2024 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 05/09/2024 HJ 13 P. 3
On May 1, 2024 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass 05/01/2024 (Vote 20-0; CC)
On April 24, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 05/01/2024 10:00 am LOB 210-211
On April 17, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/25/2024 11:00 am LOB 206-208
On March 12, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced 03/07/2024 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs HJ 7 P. 110
On March 7, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment # 2024-0834s, AA, VV; 03/07/2024; SJ 6
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0834s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 03/07/2024; SJ 6
On February 22, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0834s, 03/07/2024; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 9
On January 31, 2024 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 02/07/2024, Room 100, SH, 09:15 am; SC 6
On December 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Health and Human Services; SJ 1