+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On July 30, 2024 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 07/26/2024; Chapter 0307; Effective 07/26/2024
On July 15, 2024 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 HJ 16 P. 51
On July 11, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/13/2024); SJ 18
On May 30, 2024 in the Senate:
- Sen. Birdsell Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, MA, VV; 05/30/2024; SJ 16
On May 23, 2024 in the House:
- Amendment # 2024-1831h: AA VV 05/23/2024 HJ 14 P. 146
- FLAM # 2024-2070h (Rep. Phillips): AF RC 176-185 05/23/2024 HJ 14 P. 147
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1831h: MA DV 192-171 05/23/2024 HJ 14 P. 149
On May 15, 2024 in the House:
- Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1831h 05/08/2024 (Vote 11-9; RC) HC 20 P. 27
- Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
On May 8, 2024 in the House:
- ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 05/15/2024 01:00 pm LOB 205-207
On May 2, 2024 in the House:
- ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 05/08/2024 11:00 am LOB 205-207
On April 24, 2024 in the House:
- ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 05/01/2024 10:00 am LOB 210-211
On April 17, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/25/2024 02:00 pm LOB 206-208
On April 2, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 03/28/2024 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs HJ 10 P. 228
On March 21, 2024 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 03/21/2024; SJ 7
On March 19, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/21/2024, Vote 7-0; SC 11A
On March 7, 2024 in the Senate:
- Sen. Prentiss Floor Amendment # 2024-0985s, AA, VV; 03/07/2024; SJ 6
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0985s, MA, VV; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/07/2024; SJ 6
On February 15, 2024 in the Senate:
- Special Order to 03/07/2024, Without Objection, MA; 02/15/2024 SJ 4
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/07/2024, Vote 4-1; SC 9
On February 8, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/15/2024, Vote 4-1; SC 7
On January 25, 2024 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/31/2024, Room 100, SH, 10:00 am; SC 5
On December 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Health and Human Services; SJ 1
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor