+ − Actions (9)
On September 23, 2020 in the House:
- Died on Table
On June 30, 2020 in the House:
- Vacated and Laid on Table MA VV 06/30/2020 HJ 10 P. 3
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 03/17/2020 10:30 am LOB 207
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced 01/09/2020 and referred to Education HJ 2 P. 59
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0074s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 01/30/2020; SJ 2
- Committee Amendment # 2020-0074s, AA, VV; 01/30/2020; SJ 2
On January 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0074s, 01/30/2020; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 4
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/14/2020, Room 103, LOB, 10:15 am; SC 2
On January 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Education and Workforce Development; SJ 1