+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (19)
On July 30, 2024 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 07/26/2024; Chapter 0306; Effective 01/01/2025
On July 15, 2024 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 HJ 16 P. 51
On July 11, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/13/2024); SJ 18
On May 30, 2024 in the Senate:
- Sen. Birdsell Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, MA, VV; 05/30/2024; SJ 16
On May 23, 2024 in the House:
- Amendment # 2024-1785h (NT): AA VV 05/23/2024 HJ 14 P. 7
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1785h: MA VV 05/23/2024 HJ 14 P. 7
On May 15, 2024 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1785h (NT) 05/15/2024 (Vote 18-0; CC) HC 20 P. 8
On May 8, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 05/15/2024 10:00 am LOB 302-304
On May 1, 2024 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 05/07/2024 10:00 am LOB 302-304
On April 15, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 05/01/2024 10:30 am LOB 302-304
On April 12, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced 04/12/2024 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs HJ 11 P. 103
On April 11, 2024 in the Senate:
- Sen. Prentiss Floor Amendment # 2024-1475s, AA, VV; 04/11/2024; SJ 9
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1475s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 04/11/2024; SJ 9
On April 9, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/11/2024, Vote 7-0; SC 14A
On April 5, 2024 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1264s, MA, VV; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 04/05/2024; SJ 8
- Committee Amendment # 2024-1264s, AA, VV; 04/05/2024; SJ 8
On March 20, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1264s, 04/05/2024, Vote 4-1; SC 13
On January 25, 2024 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/31/2024, Room 100, SH, 09:45 am; SC 5
On December 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Health and Human Services; SJ 1
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor