+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (4)
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Committee, MA, VV; 03/16/2017; SJ 9
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/16/2017; SC 14
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/25/2017, Room 101, LOB, 10:10 am; SC 7
On January 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/05/2017 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; SJ 4