+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (4)
On February 15, 2024 in the Senate:
- Refer to Interim Study, MA, VV; 02/15/2024; SJ 4
On February 7, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 02/15/2024; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 7
On December 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/09/2024, Room 103, SH, 09:00 am; SC 1
On December 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; SJ 1