+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (17)
On August 7, 2024 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 08/02/2024; Chapter 362; Effective 10/01/2024
On July 23, 2024 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 HJ 16 P. 56
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2024-2356e: AA VV (in recess of) 06/13/2024 HJ 16 P. 51
On July 18, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/13/2024); SJ 18
On July 10, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2024-2356e Adopted, VV, (In recess of 06/13/2024); SJ 18
On May 30, 2024 in the Senate:
- Sen. Avard Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, MA, VV; 05/30/2024; SJ 16
On May 23, 2024 in the House:
- Amendment # 2024-1772h: AA VV 05/23/2024 HJ 14 P. 39
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1772h: MA VV 05/23/2024 HJ 14 P. 39
On May 15, 2024 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1772h 05/08/2024 (Vote 20-0; CC) HC 20 P. 13
On May 1, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 05/08/2024 09:30 am LOB 305
On April 16, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/24/2024 11:30 am LOB 305
On April 10, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 03/28/2024 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development HJ 10 P. 228
On April 5, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment # 2024-1235s, AA, VV; 04/05/2024; SJ 8
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1235s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 04/05/2024; SJ 8
On March 21, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1235s, 04/05/2024; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 13
On March 12, 2024 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 03/19/2024, Room 103, SH, 09:15 am; SC 11
On December 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; SJ 1