+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 20, 2024 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 06/14/2024; Chapter 0089; Effective 08/13/2024
On May 30, 2024 in the House:
- Enrolled 05/30/2024 HJ 15 P. 10
On May 30, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 05/23/2024); SJ 15
On May 2, 2024 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 05/02/2024 HJ 12 P. 22
On April 25, 2024 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass 04/23/2024 (Vote 19-0; CC) HC 17 P. 14
On April 17, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/23/2024 10:30 am LOB 202-204
- Executive Session: 04/23/2024 12:00 pm LOB 202-204
- Full Committee Work Session: 04/23/2024 11:00 am LOB 202-204
On April 10, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 03/28/2024 and referred to Ways and Means HJ 10 P. 228
On April 5, 2024 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 04/05/2024; SJ 8
On March 21, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/05/2024; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 13
On March 12, 2024 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 03/19/2024, Room 103, SH, 09:00 am; SC 11
On December 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; SJ 1