+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On July 30, 2024 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 07/26/2024; Chapter 0303; Effective 09/24/2024
On July 15, 2024 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 HJ 16 P. 51
On July 11, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/13/2024); SJ 18
On May 30, 2024 in the Senate:
- Sen. Avard Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, MA, VV; 05/30/2024; SJ 16
On May 23, 2024 in the House:
- Amendment # 2024-1819h: AA VV 05/23/2024 HJ 14 P. 37
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1819h: MA VV 05/23/2024 HJ 14 P. 37
On May 10, 2024 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1819h 05/07/2024 (Vote 16-0; CC) HC 20 P. 11
On April 17, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 05/07/2024 10:20 am LOB 307
- Executive Session: 05/07/2024 11:45 am LOB 307
On March 2, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 02/22/2024 and referred to Fish and Game and Marine Resources HJ 6 P. 140
On January 18, 2024 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 01/18/2024; SJ 2
On January 9, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 01/18/2024; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 3
On December 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/09/2024, Room 103, SH, 09:30 am; SC 1
On December 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; SJ 1