+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On October 10, 2024 in the Senate:
- Notwithstanding the Governor's Veto, Shall SB543 Become Law: RC 10Y-13N, Veto Sustained, lacking the necessary two-thirds vote; 10/10/2024; SJ 18
On July 16, 2024 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by Governor 07/10/2024
On June 27, 2024 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 HJ 16
On June 27, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/13/2024); SJ 18
On June 18, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2024-2315e Adopted, VV, (In recess of 06/13/2024); SJ 18
On June 18, 2024 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2024-2315e: AA VV (in recess of) 06/13/2024 HJ 16 P. 43
On May 23, 2024 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA DV 172-168 05/23/2024 HJ 14 P. 173
- Removed from Consent (Reps. Vose, Notter, Plett, C. Brown, D. Thomas, Osborne, Bernardy, Summers, Hobson, Ploszaj) 05/23/2024 HJ 14 P. 2
- Lay SB543 on Table (Rep. Vose): MF DV 170-175 05/23/2024 HJ 14 P. 173
On May 14, 2024 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass 05/14/2024 (Vote 14-3; CC) HC 20 P. 12
On April 24, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 05/14/2024 10:30 am LOB 201
On April 12, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/24/2024 11:30 am LOB 201
On April 10, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 03/28/2024 and referred to Public Works and Highways HJ 10 P. 228
On April 5, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment # 2024-1236s, AA, VV; 04/05/2024; SJ 8
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1236s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 04/05/2024; SJ 8
On March 21, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1236s, 04/05/2024; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 13
On February 21, 2024 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 03/05/2024, Room 103, SH, 09:45 am; SC 9
On December 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; SJ 1
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor