+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (15)
On July 30, 2024 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 07/26/2024; Chapter 0302; Effective 07/26/2024
On July 15, 2024 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 HJ 16 P. 51
On July 11, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/13/2024); SJ 18
On May 30, 2024 in the Senate:
- Sen. Avard Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, MA, VV; 05/30/2024; SJ 16
On May 23, 2024 in the House:
- Amendment # 2024-1782h: AA VV 05/23/2024 HJ 14 P. 37
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1782h: MA VV 05/23/2024 HJ 14 P. 37
On May 10, 2024 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1782h 05/07/2024 (Vote 16-0; CC) HC 20 P. 11
On April 17, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 05/07/2024 11:10 am LOB 307
- Executive Session: 05/07/2024 11:45 am LOB 307
On April 10, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 03/28/2024 and referred to Fish and Game and Marine Resources HJ 10 P. 228
On April 5, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment # 2024-1343s, AA, VV; 04/05/2024; SJ 8
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1343s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 04/05/2024; SJ 8
On March 27, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1343s, 04/05/2024; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 13
On February 7, 2024 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 02/13/2024, Room 103, SH, 10:00 am; SC 7
On December 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; SJ 1