+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (35)
On June 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 06/25/2018; Chapter 0332; Effective 06/25/2018
On June 5, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled 05/23/2018
On June 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); SJ 18
On May 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report # 2018-2071c, Adopted, VV; 05/23/2018; SJ 18
On May 23, 2018 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report 2071c: Adopted, VV 05/23/2018
On May 17, 2018 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report # 2018-2071c Filed 05/17/2018; As Amended by the House
On May 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- ==RECONVENE== Committee of Conference Meeting: 05/17/2018, 12:30 pm, Room 103, SH
On May 16, 2018 in the House:
- Conferee Change: Rep. Packard Replaces Rep. Ohm 05/10/2018
On May 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee of Conference Meeting: 05/16/2018, 10:30 am, Room 103, SH ==RECESSED==
On May 10, 2018 in the House:
- Speaker Appoints: Reps. Ladd, T. Wolf, Ohm, Martin 05/10/2018
- House Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Reps. Ladd, Major): MA VV 05/10/2018
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- President Appoints: Senators Reagan, Giuda, D'Allesandro; 05/02/2018; SJ 15
- Sen. Daniels Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment; Requests C of C, MA, VV; 05/02/2018; SJ 15
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 1518h: MA RC 247-49 04/26/2018
- Amendment # 2018-1518h: AA VV 04/26/2018
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Executive Session: 04/18/2018 LOB 202
- Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1518h (NT) for 04/26/2018 (Vote 21-2; RC) HC 16 P. 15
- Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/17/2018 10:00 AM LOB 202
- Referred to Ways and Means 04/12/2018 HJ 12 P. 3
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 1315h: MA VV 04/12/2018 HJ 12 P. 3
- Amendment # 2018-1315h: AA VV 04/12/2018 HJ 12 P. 3
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1315h (NT) for 04/12/2018 (Vote 20-0; CC) HC 14 P. 4
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Executive Session: 04/03/2018 LOB 207
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 03/28/2018 10:15 AM LOB 207
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced 03/15/2018 and referred to Education HJ 8 P. 70
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendments 2018-0980s and 2018-1101s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 03/14/2018; SJ 7
- Sen. Watters Floor Amendment # 2018-1101s, AA, VV; 03/14/2018; SJ 7
- Sen. Feltes Floor Amendment # 2018-1034s, RC 10Y-14N, AF; 03/14/2018; SJ 7
- Committee Amendment # 2018-0980s, AA, VV; 03/14/2018; SJ 7
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0980s, 03/14/2018; SC 11
- Special Order to the next session, Without Objection, MA; 03/08/2018; SJ 6
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0980s, 03/08/2018; SC 10A
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/23/2018, Room 103, SH, 02:00 pm; SC 4
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Finance; SJ 2
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (2)
April 26, 2018: OTPA
- Yeas: 247
- Nays: 49
- Present/NV: 40
- Absent: 55
March 14, 2018: Sen. Feltes Floor Amendment 1034
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 24
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor