+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On July 30, 2024 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 07/26/2024; Chapter 0301; Effective 07/01/2024
On July 15, 2024 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 HJ 16 P. 51
On July 11, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/13/2024); SJ 18
On May 30, 2024 in the Senate:
- Sen. Avard Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, MA, VV; 05/30/2024; SJ 16
On May 3, 2024 in the House:
- Referral Waived by Committee Chair per House Rule 47(f) 05/03/2024 HJ 12
On May 2, 2024 in the House:
- Amendment # 2024-1638h (NT): AA VV 05/02/2024 HJ 12 P. 17
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1638h: MA VV 05/02/2024 HJ 12 P. 17
- Referred to Ways and Means 05/02/2024 HJ 12 P. 18
On April 24, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 04/24/2024 11:00 am LOB 305
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1638h (NT) 04/24/2024 (Vote 19-0; CC) HC 17 P. 12
On April 16, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/24/2024 11:00 am LOB 305
On April 12, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced 04/12/2024 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development HJ 11 P. 103
On April 11, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment # 2024-1462s, AA, VV; 04/11/2024; SJ 9
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1462s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 04/11/2024; SJ 9
On April 9, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1462s, 04/11/2024, Vote 7-0; SC 14A
On April 5, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment # 2024-1258s, AF, VV; 04/05/2024; SJ 8
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 04/05/2024; SJ 8
On March 21, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1258s, 04/05/2024, Vote 5-0; SC 13
On January 24, 2024 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/30/2024, Room 103, SH, 09:15 am; SC 5
On December 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- ==CANCELLED== Hearing: 01/04/2024, Room 103, SH, 09:30 am; SC 49
On December 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; SJ 1
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor