+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 05/15/2018; Chapter 0054; Effective 07/14/2018
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled 04/19/2018 HJ 13 P. 2
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 04/12/2018); SJ 13
On April 5, 2018 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 04/05/2018 HJ 11 P. 19
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/05/2018 (Vote 9-2; RC) HC 13 P. 9
- Executive Session: 03/27/2018 LOB 306
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- ==ROOM CHANGE== Public Hearing: 03/27/2018 10:45 AM LOB 203
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration HJ 7 P. 53
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 02/15/2018; SJ 4
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/15/2018; SC 7
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/31/2018, Room 101, LOB, 09:40 am; SC 5
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; SJ 2