+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (4)
On March 21, 2024 in the Senate:
- Inexpedient to Legislate, RC 14Y-10N, MA === BILL KILLED ===; 03/21/2024; SJ 7
On March 5, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/21/2024, Vote 3-2; SC 11
On February 6, 2024 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 02/13/2024, Room 103, LOB, 09:30 am; SC 7
On December 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; SJ 1
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor