+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On April 11, 2024 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 04/11/2024 HJ 11
On April 3, 2024 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 03/19/2024 (Vote 20-0; CC) HC 14 P. 6
On March 13, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 03/19/2024 10:20 am LOB 306-308
- Executive Session: 03/19/2024 10:30 am LOB 306-308
On March 2, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 02/22/2024 and referred to Election Law HJ 6 P. 140
On February 8, 2024 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 02/08/2024; SJ 3
On January 30, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/08/2024, Vote 2-1; SC 6
On January 24, 2024 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/30/2024, Room 103, LOB, 09:00 am; SC 5
On December 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; SJ 1