+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On June 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 06/25/2018; Chapter 0330; Effective 07/01/2018
On June 5, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled 05/23/2018
On June 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); SJ 18
On May 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report # 2018-2033c, Adopted, VV; 05/23/2018; SJ 18
On May 23, 2018 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report 2033c: Adopted, VV 05/23/2018
On May 17, 2018 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report # 2018-2033c Filed 05/17/2018; As Amended by the House
On May 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee of Conference Meeting: 05/16/2018, 09:45 am, Room 103, SH
On May 10, 2018 in the House:
- Speaker Appoints: Reps. Hansen, P. Schmidt, H. Marsh, L. Ober 05/10/2018
- House Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Reps. McGuire, Kurk): MA VV 05/10/2018
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- President Appoints: Senators Reagan, Carson, Soucy; 05/02/2018; SJ 15
- Sen. Carson Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment; Requests C of C, MA, VV; 05/02/2018; SJ 15
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 1591h: MA VV 04/26/2018
- Amendment # 2018-1591h: AA VV 04/26/2018
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1591h for 04/26/2018 (Vote 26-0; CC) HC 16 P. 5
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 1272h: MA VV 04/12/2018 HJ 12 P. 4
- Amendment # 2018-1272h: AA VV 04/12/2018 HJ 12 P. 4
- Executive Session: 04/18/2018 01:00 PM LOB 210-211
- Referred to Finance 04/12/2018 HJ 12 P. 5
- Division I Work Session: 04/17/2018 01:00 PM LOB 212
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1272h for 04/12/2018 (Vote 15-0; CC) HC 14 P. 4
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Executive Session: 04/03/2018 11:00 AM LOB 306
- ==ROOM CHANGE== Subcommittee Work Session: 03/29/2018 09:40 AM LOB 308
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- ==ROOM CHANGE== Subcommittee Work Session: 03/27/2018 09:00 AM LOB 203
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 03/20/2018 10:30 AM LOB 306
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration HJ 7 P. 52
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 02/15/2018; SJ 4
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/15/2018; SC 7
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/01/2018; SJ 3
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/01/2018; Vote 5-0; CC SC 5
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/24/2018, Room 101, LOB, 09:20 am; SC 4
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; SJ 2
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor