+ − Actions (8)
On September 23, 2020 in the House:
- Died on Table
On June 30, 2020 in the House:
- Vacated and Laid on Table MA VV 06/30/2020 HJ 10 P. 5
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced 02/20/2020 and referred to Ways and Means HJ 5 P. 56
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0520s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 02/13/2020; SJ 4
- Committee Amendment # 2020-0520s, AA, VV; 02/13/2020; SJ 4
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0520s, 02/13/2020; SC 6
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/15/2020, Room 100, SH, 09:15 AM; SC 2
- To Be Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Ways and Means; SJ 1