+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 2, 2024 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 05/02/2024 HJ 12 P. 10
On April 18, 2024 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 04/10/2024 (Vote 20-0; CC) HC 17 P. 8
On April 5, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 04/10/2024 01:00 pm LOB 205-207
- Full Committee Work Session: 04/10/2024 10:00 am LOB 205-207
On March 21, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 03/26/2024 01:30 pm LOB 205-207
On March 2, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 02/22/2024 and referred to Education HJ 6 P. 139
On February 20, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment # 2024-0683s, AA, VV; 02/21/2024; SJ 5
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0683s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 02/21/2024; SJ 5
On February 14, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0683s, 02/21/2024; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 8
On January 30, 2024 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 02/06/2024, Room 101, LOB, 09:00 am; SC 6
On December 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Education; SJ 1