+ − Actions (7)
On September 23, 2020 in the House:
- Died on Table
On June 30, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced and Laid on Table MA VV 06/30/2020 HJ 10 P. 5
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-1105s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 03/11/2020; SJ 6
- Committee Amendment # 2020-1105s, AA, VV; 03/11/2020; SJ 6
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-1105s, 03/11/2020; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 10
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 02/19/2020, Room 101, LOB, 09:00 am; SC 6
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- To Be Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; SJ 1