+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (24)
On June 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- II. Remainder Effective 05/01/2018
- Signed by the Governor on 06/09/2016; Chapter 0233
- I. Section 4 Effective 06/09/2016
On June 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 06/01/2016); SJ 20
On June 3, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled 06/01/2016 HJ 42 P. 58
On May 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sen. Stiles Moved to Concur with House Amendment # 1333h, NT, MA, VV; 05/19/2016; SJ 18
On May 11, 2016 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 05/11/2016 HJ 38 P. 35
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/11/2016 (Vote 17-1; CC) HC 29 P. 15
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 1333h: MA RC 262-83 04/20/2016 HJ 36 P. 28
- Amendment #2016-1333h: AA VV 04/20/2016 HJ 36 P. 28
- Referred to Ways and Means 04/20/2016 HJ 36 P. 30
- Public Hearing: 04/26/2016 10:30 AM LOB 202
- Executive Session: 04/27/2016 10:00 AM LOB 202
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-1333h (NT) for 04/20/2016 (Vote 17-2; RC) HC 24 P. 16
- Executive Session: 04/12/2016 10:00 AM LOB 305
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/05/2016 01:00 PM LOB 305
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced 03/23/2016 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development HJ 27 P. 68
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 03/24/2016; SJ 10
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/24/2016; SC 11
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 0614s, MA, VV; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/03/2016; SJ 7
- Committee Amendment 0614s, AA, VV; 03/03/2016
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-0614s, 03/03/2016; SC7
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 02/16/2016, Room 103, LOB, 01:10 pm; SC5
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/21/2016 and Referred to Transportation; SJ 3
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
April 20, 2016: OTPA
- Yeas: 262
- Nays: 83
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor