+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On October 24, 2024 in the Senate:
- Inexpedient to Legislate, Senate Rule 3-23, Adjournment 10/10/2024; SJ 18
On April 5, 2024 in the Senate:
- Sen. Avard Moved Laid on Table, MA, VV; 04/05/2024; SJ 8
- Pending Motion Ought to Pass; 04/05/2024; SJ 8
On March 26, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/05/2024, Vote 4-0; SC 13
On January 4, 2024 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/16/2024, Room 100, SH, 09:15 am; SC 2
On December 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Commerce; SJ 1
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor