+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Inexpedient to Legislate, RC 14Y-10N, MA === BILL KILLED ===; 03/03/2016; SJ 7
- Special Order SB 516 to after the Committee on Education, Without Objection, MA
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/03/2016; SC8
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- ===ROOM CHANGE=== Hearing: 02/11/2016, Room 100, SH, 02:30 pm; SC5
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/21/2016 and Referred to Health and Human Services; SJ 3
+ − Vote
March 3, 2016: Inexpedient to Legislate
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 10
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor