+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (3)
On June 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, MA, VV; 06/16/2020 SJ 8
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 03/04/2020, Room 102, LOB, 09:30 am; SC 8
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- To Be Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; SJ 1