+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On July 10, 2024 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 07/03/2024; Chapter 0166; Effective 01/01/2025
On June 25, 2024 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 HJ 16 P. 45
On June 24, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/13/2024); SJ 18
On May 23, 2024 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 05/23/2024 HJ 14 P. 6
On May 16, 2024 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass 05/15/2024 (Vote 18-0; CC) HC 20 P. 7
On May 8, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 05/15/2024 10:00 am LOB 302-304
On May 1, 2024 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 05/08/2024 10:00 am LOB 302-304
On April 9, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/24/2024 02:45 pm LOB 302-304
On March 2, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 02/22/2024 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs HJ 6 P. 139
On February 15, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment # 2024-0521s, AA, VV; 02/15/2024; SJ 4
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0521s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 02/15/2024; SJ 4
On February 9, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0521s, 02/15/2024; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 7
On January 16, 2024 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/30/2024, Room 100, SH, 09:00 am; SC 3A
On January 12, 2024 in the Senate:
- ==CANCELLED== Hearing: 01/23/2024, Room 100, SH, 09:00 am; SC 2
On December 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Commerce; SJ 1