+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On October 24, 2024 in the Senate:
- Inexpedient to Legislate, Senate Rule 3-23, Adjournment 10/10/2024; SJ 18
On March 7, 2024 in the Senate:
- Sen. Gendreau Moved Laid on Table, MA, VV; 03/07/2024; SJ 6
- Pending Motion Interim Study; 03/07/2024; SJ 6
On February 20, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 03/07/2024, Vote 4-0; SC 9
On January 3, 2024 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/09/2024, Room 101, LOB, 01:45 pm; SC 2
On December 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Transportation; SJ 1
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor