+ − Actions (12)
On July 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 07/09/2021; Chapter 0116; Effective 09/07/2021
On July 1, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/24/2021
On July 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/24/2021); SJ 20
On June 3, 2021 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 06/03/2021 HJ 8 P. 70
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 18-0; CC) HC 26 P. 8
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/28/2021 09:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/97783276704 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 02/25/2021 and referred to Fish and Game and Marine Resources HJ 4 P. 50
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-0715s, RC 23Y-1N, MA; OT3rdg; 03/18/2021; SJ 8
- Committee Amendment # 2021-0715s, RC 23Y-1N, AA; 03/18/2021; SJ 8
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0715s, 03/18/2021; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 15
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Remote Hearing: 01/26/2021, 01:45 pm; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; SC 8
On January 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/06/2021 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; SJ 3
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor