+ − Actions (7)
On September 23, 2020 in the House:
- Died on Table
On June 30, 2020 in the House:
- Vacated and Laid on Table MA VV 06/30/2020 HJ 10 P. 2
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced 02/20/2020 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs HJ 5 P. 56
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 02/13/2020; SJ 4
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/13/2020; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 6
On January 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/23/2020, Room 101, LOB, 02:15 pm; SC 3
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- To Be Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; SJ 1