+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 06/26/2015; Chapter 0177; Effective 01/01/2016
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 6/11/2015); SJ 19
On June 18, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of 6/11/2015); HJ 46, PG. 1993
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sen. Prescott Concurs with House Amendment #1366h, MA, VV; SJ 17
On June 3, 2015 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment #1366h: MA VV; HJ 44, PG. 1816-1817
- Amendment #1366h: AA VV; HJ 44, PG. 1816-1817
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1366h (NT) for Jun 3 (Vote 19-0; CC); HC 39, PG. 1628
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Executive Session: 5/12/2015 1:15 PM LOB 302
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 4/28/2015 1:15 PM LOB 302
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 4/2/2015 10:30 AM LOB 302
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; HJ 26, PG. 1274
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 0507s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; SJ 7
- Committee Amendment 0507s, AA, VV
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0507s, 3/5/15; Vote 5-0; CC; SC11
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing:=== RESCHEDULED === 2/3/15, Room 100, SH, 2:00 p.m.; SC8
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing:=== CANCELLED === 1/27/15, Room 100, SH, 2:00 p.m.; SC7
On January 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to Commerce; SJ 4