+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (36)
On August 12, 2024 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 08/02/2024; Chapter 358
- I. Sections 1-2 Effective 07/01/2024
- II. Sections 3-6 Effective 08/02/2024
On July 23, 2024 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 HJ 16 P. 56
On July 18, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/13/2024); SJ 18
On June 13, 2024 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report 2024-2271c: Adopted, VV 06/13/2024 HJ 16 P. 14
On June 12, 2024 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report # 2024-2271c, Adopted, VV; 06/13/2024; SJ 17
On June 6, 2024 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report # 2024-2271c Filed 06/06/2024; House Amendment + New Amendment HJ 15
On June 5, 2024 in the Senate:
- ==RECONVENE== Committee of Conference Meeting: 06/05/2024, 02:30 pm, Room 100, SH
On June 4, 2024 in the Senate:
- ==RECESSED== Committee of Conference Meeting: 06/04/2024, 12:00 pm, Room 100, SH
On June 3, 2024 in the Senate:
- ==RECESSED== Committee of Conference Meeting: 06/03/2024, 01:30 pm, Room 100, SH
On May 30, 2024 in the House:
- House Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Rep. Ladd): MA VV 05/30/2024 HJ 15 P. 29
- Speaker Appoints: Reps. Erf, Edwards, Wallner, Telerski 05/30/2024 HJ 15 P. 29
On May 30, 2024 in the Senate:
- Sen. Birdsell Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment; Requests C of C, MA, VV; 05/30/2024; SJ 16
- President Appoints: Senators Birdsell, Bradley, Whitley; 05/30/2024; SJ 16
On May 23, 2024 in the House:
- Amendment # 2024-1957h: AF DV 182-185 05/23/2024 HJ 14 P. 100
- Amendment # 2024-1917h (NT): AA RC 192-178 05/23/2024 HJ 14 P. 100
- FLAM # 2024-2125h (NT) (Rep. Aron): AA DV 189-181 05/23/2024 HJ 14 P. 103
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1917h and 2024-2125h: MA DV 235-136 05/23/2024 HJ 14 P. 104
On May 16, 2024 in the House:
- Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1957h (NT) 05/16/2024 (Vote 13-12; RC) HC 20 P. 22
- Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1917h (NT)
On May 13, 2024 in the House:
- Division III Work Session: 05/14/2024 10:00 am LOB 210-211
On May 8, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 05/14/2024 01:00 pm LOB 210-211
On April 24, 2024 in the House:
- ==CANCELLED== Division II Work Session: 04/29/2024 10:00 am LOB 209
On April 17, 2024 in the House:
- Division III Work Session: 04/29/2024 01:00 pm LOB 210-211
On April 11, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/17/2024 02:30 pm LOB 210-211
On April 4, 2024 in the House:
- Vacated and Referred to Finance (): MA VV (in recess of) 03/28/2024 HJ 10 P. 227
On April 3, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 03/28/2024 and referred to Education HJ 10 P. 227
On March 21, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment # 2024-1230s, AA, VV; 03/21/2024; SJ 7
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1230s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 03/21/2024; SJ 7
On March 19, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1230s, 03/21/2024, Vote 7-0; SC 11A
On February 15, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment # 2024-0563s, AA, VV; 02/15/2024; SJ 4
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0563s, MA, VV; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/15/2024; SJ 4
On February 9, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0563s, 02/15/2024; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 7
On December 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/03/2024, Room 101, LOB, 01:30 pm; SC 49
On December 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Health and Human Services; SJ 1
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor