+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (3)
On June 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, MA, VV; 06/16/2020 SJ 8
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- ==CANCELLED== Hearing: 03/17/2020, Room 103, LOB, 10:00 am; SC 11
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- To Be Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; SJ 1