+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On July 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- II. Remainder shall take effect 07/02/2018
- Signed by the Governor on 07/02/2018; Chapter 0364
- I. Section 6-11 Effective 09/30/2018
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); SJ 18
On June 11, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled 05/23/2018
On June 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-2111e Adopted, VV, (In recess of 05/23/2018); SJ 18
On June 5, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-2111e: AA VV 05/23/2018
On May 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report # 2018-1978c, Adopted, VV; 05/23/2018; SJ 18
On May 23, 2018 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report 1978c: Adopted, VV 05/23/2018
On May 17, 2018 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report # 2018-1978c Filed 05/17/2018; House Amendment + New Amendment
On May 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- President Appoints: Senators Bradley, Gray, Feltes; 05/10/2018; SJ 17
- Sen. Bradley Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment; Requests C of C, MA, VV; 05/10/2018; SJ 17
On May 10, 2018 in the House:
- House Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Rep. McGuire): MA VV 05/10/2018
- Speaker Appoints: Reps. Beaudoin, Schultz, Sytek, Hansen 05/10/2018
On May 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee of Conference Meeting: 05/14/2018, 01:00 pm, Room 100, SH
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 1750h: MA VV 05/02/2018
- Amendment # 2018-1750h: AA VV 05/02/2018
On April 25, 2018 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1750h (NT) for 05/02/2018 (Vote 19-0; CC) HC 17 P. 6
- Executive Session: 04/24/2018 LOB 306
On April 17, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 04/24/2018 09:30 AM LOB 306
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 04/17/2018 09:00 AM LOB 308
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/11/2018 02:15 PM LOB 306
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced 03/22/2018 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration HJ 10 P. 53
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-1098s, RC 22Y-0N, MA; OT3rdg; 03/21/2018; SJ 9
- Committee Amendment # 2018-1098s, AA, VV; 03/21/2018; SJ 9
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1098s, 03/21/2018; SC 13
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/25/2018, Room 101, LOB, 09:15 am; SC 4
On December 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Health and Human Services; SJ 1
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Vote
March 21, 2018: Ought to Pass with Amendment
- Yeas: 22
- Present/NV: 22
- Absent: 2