+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- II. Remainder Effective 05/30/2018
- I. Section 2 Effective 11/30/2018
- Signed by the Governor on 05/30/2018; Chapter 0147
On May 9, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled 05/03/2018
On May 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 05/03/2018); SJ 17
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 04/26/2018
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/26/2018 (Vote 18-2; CC) HC 16 P. 6
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- Executive Session: 04/17/2018 10:00 AM LOB 205
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/04/2018 01:00 PM LOB 205
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs HJ 7 P. 52
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment # 2018-0511s, AA, VV; 02/15/2018; SJ 4
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-0513s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 02/15/2018; SJ 4
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0513s, 02/15/2018; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 7
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 02/06/2018, Room 101, LOB, 01:45 pm; SC 6
On December 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Health and Human Services; SJ 1
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor