+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On May 2, 2024 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 05/02/2024 HJ 12 P. 14
On April 18, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 04/10/2024 01:00 pm LOB 306-308
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 04/10/2024 (Vote 15-0; CC) HC 17 P. 10
On March 27, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/10/2024 01:00 pm LOB 306-308
On March 2, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 02/22/2024 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration HJ 6 P. 139
On February 21, 2024 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 02/21/2024; SJ 5
On February 15, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/21/2024; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 8
On January 24, 2024 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 02/07/2024, Room 103, SH, 09:45 am; SC 5
On December 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; SJ 1
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor