+ − Actions (8)
On September 23, 2020 in the House:
- Died on Table
On June 30, 2020 in the House:
- Vacated and Laid on Table MA VV 06/30/2020 HJ 10 P. 2
On June 3, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced 03/12/2020 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs HJ 8 P. 226
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment # 2020-0786s, AA, VV; 03/05/2020; SJ 5
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0786s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 03/05/2020; SJ 5
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0786s, 03/05/2020; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 9
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 02/19/2020, Room 103, SH, 02:15 pm; SC 7
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- To Be Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Commerce; SJ 1