+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On October 29, 2018 in the House:
- Interim Study Report: Recommended for Future Legislation (Vote 12-5)
On September 20, 2018 in the House:
- Interim Study Subcommittee Work Session: 09/27/2018 10:00 AM LOB205
- Executive Session: 10/16/2018 01:00 PM LOB205
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- Refer for Interim Study: MA VV 04/26/2018
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 04/26/2018 (Vote 22-1; CC) HC 16 P. 6
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- Executive Session: 04/17/2018 10:00 AM LOB 205
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/10/2018 11:00 AM LOB 205
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced 03/15/2018 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs HJ 8 P. 70
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sen. Daniels Moved Laid on Table, MA, VV; 03/14/2018; SJ 7
- Committee Amendment # 2018-0978s, AA, VV; 03/14/2018; SJ 7
- Sen. Daniels Moved to Remove From Table, MA, VV; 03/14/2018; SJ 7
- Pending Motion Ought to Pass with Amendment #2018-0978s; 03/14/2018; SJ 7
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-0978s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 03/14/2018; SJ 7
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0978s, 03/14/2018; SC 11
- Special Order to the next session, Without Objection, MA; 03/08/2018; SJ 6
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0978s, 03/08/2018; SC 10A
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/24/2018, Room 101, LOB, 01:15 pm; SC 4
On December 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Health and Human Services; SJ 1