+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On August 7, 2024 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 08/02/2024; Chapter 356; Effective 07/01/2024
On July 23, 2024 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 HJ 16 P. 56
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2024-2353e: AA VV (in recess of) 06/13/2024 HJ 16 P. 51
On July 18, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/13/2024); SJ 18
On July 10, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2024-2353e Adopted, VV, (In recess of 06/13/2024); SJ 18
On May 30, 2024 in the Senate:
- Sen. Birdsell Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, MA, VV; 05/30/2024; SJ 16
On May 23, 2024 in the House:
- Amendment # 2024-1958h: AA VV 05/23/2024 HJ 14 P. 86
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1958h: MA VV 05/23/2024 HJ 14 P. 86
On May 16, 2024 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1958h 05/16/2024 (Vote 25-0; RC) HC 20 P. 21
On May 8, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 05/14/2024 01:00 pm LOB 210-211
On May 2, 2024 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 05/02/2024 HJ 12 P. 16
- Referred to Finance 05/02/2024 HJ 12 P. 16
- Division III Work Session: 05/07/2024 10:00 am LOB 210-211
- Division III Work Session: 05/10/2024 10:00 am LOB 210-211
On April 25, 2024 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass 04/24/2024 (Vote 17-3; CC) HC 17 P. 11
On April 12, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 04/17/2024 03:00 pm LOB 206-208
On April 11, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/17/2024 02:00 pm LOB 206-208
On April 10, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 03/28/2024 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs HJ 10 P. 228
On April 5, 2024 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 04/05/2024; SJ 8
On March 27, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/05/2024, Vote 6-0; SC 13
On March 7, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment # 2024-0831s, AA, VV; 03/07/2024; SJ 6
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0831s, MA, VV; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/07/2024; SJ 6
On February 22, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0831s, 03/07/2024; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 9
On January 4, 2024 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/10/2024, Room 101, LOB, 09:15 am; SC 2
On December 12, 2023 in the Senate:
- To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Health and Human Services; SJ 1
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor