+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (4)
On February 15, 2024 in the Senate:
- Refer to Interim Study, MA, VV; 02/15/2024; SJ 4
On February 6, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 02/15/2024, Vote 4-0; SC 7
On December 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/04/2024, Room 103, SH, 09:15 am; SC 49
On December 12, 2023 in the Senate:
- To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; SJ 1