+ − Actions (18)
On July 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 07/28/2020; Chapter 0036; Effective 01/01/2020
On July 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 06/29/2020); SJ 9
On July 16, 2020 in the House:
- Enrolled 06/30/2020 HJ 10 P. 74
On June 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Sen. Levesque Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, MA, VV; 06/29/2020; SJ 9
On January 8, 2020 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-2723h: MA VV 01/08/2020 HJ 1 P. 39
- Amendment # 2019-2723h: AA VV 01/08/2020 HJ 1 P. 39
On November 8, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2723h (Vote 19-1; CC) HC 50 P. 7
On October 4, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session: 10/31/2019 11:00 am LOB 308
On September 10, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 10/03/2019 10:00 am LOB 305
On August 27, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 09/10/2019 02:00 pm LOB 308
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session: 04/25/2019 11:00 am LOB 308
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/10/2019 01:00 pm LOB 308
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Election Law HJ 11 P. 73
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 03/27/2019; SJ 10
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/27/2019; Vote 5-0; CC SC 15
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/30/2019, Room 102, LOB, 09:45 am; SC 8
On January 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; SJ 4
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor