+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (4)
On January 18, 2024 in the Senate:
- Refer to Interim Study, MA, VV; 01/18/2024; SJ 2
On January 16, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 01/18/2024; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 3A
On January 2, 2024 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/09/2024, Room 101, LOB, 09:30 am; SC 2
On December 12, 2023 in the Senate:
- To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Education; SJ 1
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor