+ − Actions (8)
On September 23, 2020 in the House:
- Died on Table
On June 30, 2020 in the House:
- Vacated and Laid on Table MA VV 06/30/2020 HJ 10 P. 4
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 03/18/2020 11:30 am LOB 208
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced 01/09/2020 and referred to Judiciary HJ 2 P. 59
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 01/30/2020; SJ 2
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 01/30/2020; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 4
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/21/2020, Room 100, SH, 10:00 am; SC 2
- To Be Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Judiciary; SJ 1